Cheatham v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.
Defendant: Tim Parkman, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Chase Home Finance, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00743
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pulvere, Graham)
November 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Correction re #25 Answer to Complaint, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #25 )(cnw, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hess, Joshua) (Main Document 25 replaced on 11/27/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD) (cnw, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 11/27/2019 to remove Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., as a filer (cnw, ).
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Tim Parkman, Inc.'s ("Defendants") Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #21 ), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 27, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/12/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc. (Pulvere, Graham) Modified on 11/12/2019 to clarify text(cnw, ).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Answer due from Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., on 11/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/5/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct the motion event (cnw, ).
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Pulvere, Graham)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tim Parkman, Inc. (Pulvere, Graham) Modified on 10/30/2019 to clarify as satisfying #16 notice of deficiency as to Tim Parkman, Inc. (cnw, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; Tim Parkman, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: granting #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants may file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 11/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/22/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (2 defs) Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; Tim Parkman, Inc. (cnw, )
October 22, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #13 MOTION - Attorney Carleton P. Ketcham, III for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc.. (Pulvere, Graham) Modified on 10/22/2019 to clarify text (cnw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (cnw, ).
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hess, Joshua)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Chase Home Finance, L.L.C, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (2 defs) Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (cnw, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Motion (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Chase and co-def Chase Home Finance, LLC shall file their answers on or before 11/13/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 10/21/2019. (cnw, )
October 21, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #8 MOTION - Attorney John David Collins for Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 10/21/2019 to correct the motion event (cnw, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card signed by R Jones signed by R Jones for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Harper, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (Harper, Michael)
October 4, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #5 for pdf which was incorrectly filed as a certificate of service) (cnw, )
October 4, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.; Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc., served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #4 for pdf which was incorrectly filed as a certificate of service) (cnw, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 (SUMMONS Returned Executed) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr re #1 Complaint, (Harper, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2019 to reflect the correct event (cnw, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 (SUMMONS Returned Executed) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr re #1 Complaint, (Harper, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2019 to reflect the correct event (cnw, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (cnw, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc., and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (cnw, ) Modified on 10/4/2019 to clarify text & correct date (cnw, ).
October 2, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055123.), filed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #3 original Civil Cover Sheet) (cnw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheatham v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Parkman, Inc.
Represented By: Carleton P. Ketcham, III
Represented By: Graham Ross Pulvere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Carleton P. Ketcham, III
Represented By: Graham Ross Pulvere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, L.L.C.
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Stephen Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?