Wright v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sheri Wright
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00761
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/11/2019; directing counsel for the parties, on or before 12/11/2019, to confirm consent electronically or to complete and send the appropriate attached form to the Clerk. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/20/19. (djy, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Rummage, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Rummage, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Rummage, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Rummage, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/4/2019. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
November 1, 2019 ***Attorney Reid Stephens Manley for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation added pursuant to the #6 motion. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation (kh, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Kelly W. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019; PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (kh, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation and mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Sheri Wright (kh, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sheri Wright. (kh, )
October 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sheri Wright. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055227.), filed by Sheri Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Wright
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?