Parker v. Valley National Bank Corp (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Taneesha R. Parker
Defendant: Valley National Bank Corp, Valley National Bank Corp doing business as Valley Bank formerly known as Aliant Bank and Aliant Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv00782
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Valley National Bank Corp. re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bullock, Susan) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add the link to the #9 Notice (amf, ).
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Valley National Bank Corp; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
November 22, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #8 MOTION - Attorney Wesley Clyde Redmond for Valley National Bank Corp added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law In Support by Valley National Bank Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Judiet Culp, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-5 of Declaration of Judiet Culp)(Bullock, Susan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Taneesha R. Parker re #6 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.. (amf, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Taneesha R. Parker; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/18/2019; copy mailed to plf with Conflict Statement form. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Valley National Bank Corp served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (wcl, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Valley National Bank Corp. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/17/2019. (wcl, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Taneesha R. Parker; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/28/2019; copy mailed to plf with Conflict Statement form. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
October 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Taneesha R. Parker. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Valley National Bank Corp (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055279.), filed by Taneesha R. Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Valley National Bank Corp (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taneesha R. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley National Bank Corp
Represented By: Susan Ware Bullock
Represented By: Wesley Clyde Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley National Bank Corp doing business as Valley Bank formerly known as Aliant Bank
Represented By: Susan Ware Bullock
Represented By: Wesley Clyde Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliant Bank
Represented By: Susan Ware Bullock
Represented By: Wesley Clyde Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?