Haskew v. First Data Corporation
Plaintiff: Virginia Haskew
Defendant: First Data Corporation, Fiserv and First Data Corporation also known as Fiserv doing business as Money Network
Case Number: 2:2019cv00795
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time; on or before 1/17/2020, the parties shall file their joint stipulation for dismissal or def shall file a responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/18/19. (djy, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by First Data Corporation. (Singley, Scott)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's #12 Motion for John Peterson Admission Pro Hac Vice, it is ORDERED that the motion is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/2/19. (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for John W. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75.00 receipt number 4602055855.) by First Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 fee receipt)(djy, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by First Data Corporation re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Singley, Scott)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to First Data Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) First Data Corporation.(djy, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed #7 Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is hereby GRANTED; Defendant's Answer responsive pleading deadline shall be due on or before 12/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/15/19. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 15, 2019 ***Attorney John Wellington Peterson for First Data Corporation added pursuant to #7 motion (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED) by First Data Corporation. (Singley, Scott)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Kelly Webster for First Data Corporation served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (djy, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Virginia Haskew re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Riemer, Kenneth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to First Data Corporation; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Virginia Haskew; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Virginia Haskew. (amf, )
October 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Virginia Haskew. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Data Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055336), filed by Virginia Haskew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, (2) Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, ) (amf, ). Modified on 10/25/2019 to attach the filing fee receipt which was originally omitted in error (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskew v. First Data Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Corporation
Represented By: Scott Fuller Singley
Represented By: John Wellington Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv
Represented By: Scott Fuller Singley
Represented By: John Wellington Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Corporation also known as Fiserv doing business as Money Network
Represented By: Scott Fuller Singley
Represented By: John Wellington Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Haskew
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?