Accident Insurance Co., Inc. v. Mathews Development Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Co., Inc.
Defendant: Courtney Jordan, Edward Thomas, Kelvin Wortham, Mathews Development Company, LLC, James E. Mathews, Ruth Thomas and Sheretha Wortham
Case Number: 2:2019cv00848
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James E. Mathews re #27 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sefton, Patrick) (Main Document 32 replaced on 12/26/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 12/26/2019 to add the link to the #27 Notice (amf, ).
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due from Mathews Development Company, LLC & James E. Mathews by 1/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/26/2019. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for James E. Mathews & Mathews Development Company, LLC. (amf, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mathews Development Company, LLC. (Sefton, Patrick) Modified on 12/26/2019 to remove as filed on behalf of Dft James E. Mathews (amf, ).
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by James E. Mathews, Mathews Development Company, LLC. (Sefton, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to James E. Mathews, Mathews Development Company, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for James E. Mathews, Mathews Development Company, LLC. (wcl, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Ladd Wheeler Sefton on behalf of James E. Mathews, Mathews Development Company, LLC (Sefton, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Courtney Jordan re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (McInnes, Mahaley) (Main Document 24 replaced on 12/19/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 12/19/2019 (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
December 19, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Edward Thomas, Ruth Thomas re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (McInnes, Mahaley) (Main Document 23 replaced on 12/19/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 12/19/2019 to add as also filed on behalf of Dft Ruth Thomas (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kelvin Wortham, Sheretha Wortham re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (McInnes, Mahaley) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/19/2019 to attach a properly published PDF document) (amf, ). Modified on 12/19/2019 (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
December 16, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 21 Text Order, to reflect the proper response/reply dates as "1/3/2020" & "1/10/2020", which were previously entered with the year "2019" in error. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that plf shall respond to the #13 motion to dismiss on or before 1/3/2020; Dfts may file a reply on or before 1/10/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/16/2019. (No PDF attached to this entry)(amf, ) Modified on 12/16/2019 to reflect the proper response/reply dates of 2020 and not 2019 (amf, ).
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by Accident Insurance Co., Inc.. (Finch, Frederick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of Alias Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by K. Mathews for James E. Mathews, served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (amf, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of Alias Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by K. Mathews for Mathews Development Company, LLC, served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (amf, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 Alias Summons issued as to Mathews Development Company, LLC & James E. Mathews; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Courtney Jordan, Kelvin Wortham, Sheretha Wortham, Edward Thomas, & Ruth Thomas; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Courtney Jordan, Edward Thomas, Ruth Thomas, Kelvin Wortham, & Sheretha Wortham. (amf, )
December 6, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #13 MOTION - Attorney Christina Diane Crow for Courtney Jordan, Edward Thomas, Ruth Thomas, Kelvin Wortham, & Sheretha Wortham added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by Courtney Jordan, Edward Thomas, Ruth Thomas, Kelvin Wortham, Sheretha Wortham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (McInnes, Mahaley)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay by Courtney Jordan, Edward Thomas, Ruth Thomas, Kelvin Wortham, Sheretha Wortham. (McInnes, Mahaley). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/9/2019 (amf, ).
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Mathews Development Company, LLC with no notations. (amf, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to James E. Mathews with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (amf, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelvin Wortham for Kelvin Wortham served on 11/16/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (amf, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by C.B. Jackson for Courtney Jordan served on 11/16/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (amf, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint signed by Edward Thomas for: Edward Thomas served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019; Ruth Thomas served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (kr, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint signed by Sheretha Wortham for Sheretha Wortham served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (kr, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Courtney Jordan, Kelvin Wortham, Sheretha Wortham, Edward Thomas, & Ruth Thomas; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint.(amf, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Accident Insurance Co., Inc. re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Finch, Frederick) Modified on 11/14/2019 to add the link to the #3 Notice (amf, ).
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James E. Mathews & Mathews Development Company, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Accident Insurance Co., Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Accident Insurance Co., Inc.. (amf, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Courtney Jordan, James E. Mathews, Mathews Development Company, LLC, Edward Thomas, Ruth Thomas, Kelvin Wortham, Sheretha Wortham (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055552), filed by Accident Insurance Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accident Insurance Co., Inc. v. Mathews Development Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Jordan
Represented By: Mahaley P. McInnes
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Thomas
Represented By: Mahaley P. McInnes
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Wortham
Represented By: Mahaley P. McInnes
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathews Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Ladd Wheeler Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Mathews
Represented By: Patrick Ladd Wheeler Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Thomas
Represented By: Mahaley P. McInnes
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheretha Wortham
Represented By: Mahaley P. McInnes
Represented By: Christina Diane Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Co., Inc.
Represented By: Murray S Flint
Represented By: Frederick Lane Finch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?