Hardy et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Freddrick Hardy and Selena Hardy
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00851
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than January 27, 2019 as further out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/23/2019. (kh, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.(Manley, Reid)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Manley, Reid)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #5 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/11/2019. (kh, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Reply to response to order to show cause re #7 Order to Show Cause,,, filed by Freddrick Hardy, Selena Hardy. (Herring, Myles)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Selena Hardy, Freddrick Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Herring, Myles)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
November 21, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Judge Doyle, case reassigned: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support (djy, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that on or before December 6, 2019, Plaintiffs shall show cause, if any there be, why Defendants' #5 Motion should not be granted. Defendants may reply on or before December 20, 2019. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment. See Attached Explanation. As indicated in the notice of assignment, the parties must confirm their decision to consent to the Magistrate Judge in writing. Accordingly, any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before December 6, 2019. CONSENT FORMS MAY NOW BE SUBMITTED ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/15/2019. (kh, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Freddrick Hardy, Selena Hardy. (Watts, John)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Rummage, Ryan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Freddrick Hardy, Selena Hardy, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (kh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (kh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (kh, )
November 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Freddrick Hardy, Selena Hardy. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 6, 2019 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed by Selena Hardy, Freddrick Hardy.(no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, case number 03-CV-2019-901810.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055599) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddrick Hardy
Represented By: Myles Stanley Herring, Jr.
Represented By: John Griffin Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Hardy
Represented By: Myles Stanley Herring, Jr.
Represented By: John Griffin Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?