Daniel v. Titlemax of Alabama, Inc.
Appellant: Kisha Yvonne Daniel
Appellee: TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Case Number: 2:2019cv00859
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Correction re #5 Case Assigned/Reassigned. The wrong pdf was attached when originally filed. The correct pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Correct pdf of #5 Case Reassigned)(dmn, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/17/2019, wrong pdf attached.) (dmn, ). Modified on 12/17/2019 (dmn, ).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy 8018(a), it is ORDERED that this appeal is set for submission, without oral argument, on 2/19/2020, with the appellant's opening brief due by 1/6/2020, the appellee's response brief due by 2/5/2020, and appellant's reply brief due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/2019. Furnished Bankruptcy Clerk. (dmn, ) Modified on 12/11/2019 to include furnished text. (dmn, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellee's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal filed with US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #2 Doc. 29, Debtor's Motion to Consolidate, #3 USBC Docket Sheet 18-33069)(dmn, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal filed with US Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet 18-33069, #2 Doc 71, Appellant's Statement of Issues Presented on Appeal, #3 Doc 72, Notice of Appellant's Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #4 Doc 1, Voluntary Petition, #5 Doc 2, Chapter 13 Plan, #6 Doc 12, TitleMax Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #7 Doc 21, Appellant's Amended Schedule D, #8 Doc 27, TitleMax Motion to Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay, #9 Doc 33, Appellant's Motion to Compel Discovery, #10 Doc 39, Order on Motion to Compel, #11 Doc 44, Appellant's Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #12 Doc 45, Appellant's Amended Schedule D, #13 Doc 46, Appellant's Amended Schedule A/B and C, #14 Doc 53, Hearing Transcript, #15 Doc 54, Post Hearing Brief (TitleMax), #16 Doc 55, Post Hearing Brief (Appellant), #17 Doc 57, Memorandum Decision/Opinion, #18 Doc 58, Absence of Stay, #19 Exhibit 1, 2/15/2017 Title Pawn, #20 Exhibit 2, 3/16/2017 Title Pawn, #21 Exhibit 3, 4/18/2017 Title Pawn, #22 Exhibit 4, 6/13/2017 Title Pawn, #23 Exhibit 5, 7/27/2017 Title Pawn, #24 Exhibit 6, 8/31/2017 Title Pawn, #25 Exhibit 7, 10/13/2017 Title Pawn, #26 Exhibit 8, 11/29/2017 Title Pawn, #27 Exhibit 9, 1/5/2018 Title Pawn, #28 Exhibit 10, 2/14/2018 Title Pawn, #29 Exhibit 11, 3/14/2018 Title Pawn, #30 Exhibit 12, 4/20/2018 Title Pawn, #31 Exhibit 13, 5/18/2018 Title Pawn, #32 Exhibit 14, 6/27/2018 Title Pawn, #33 Exhibit 15, 8/25/2018 Title Pawn, #34 Exhibit 16, 3/16/2017 Receipt, #35 Exhibit 17, 4/18/2017 Receipt, #36 Exhibit 18, 6/13/2017 Receipt, #37 Exhibit 19, 7/27/2017 Receipt, #38 Exhibit 20, 8/31/2017 Receipt, #39 Exhibit 21, 10/13/2017 Receipt, #40 Exhibit 22, 11/29/2017 Receipt, #41 Exhibit 23, 1/5/2018 Receipt, #42 Exhibit 24, 2/14/2018 Receipt, #43 Exhibit 25, 3/14/2018 Receipt, #44 Exhibit 26, 4/20/2018 Receipt, #45 Exhibit 27, 5/18/2018 Receipt, #46 Exhibit 28, 6/27/2018 Receipt, #47 Exhibit 29, 8/25/2018 Receipt, #48 Exhibit 30, Transaction History, #49 Exhibit 31, Certificate of Title)(dmn, ) Modified on 11/22/2019 to include attachment descriptions. (dmn, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL of Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Kisha Yvonne Daniel. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-33069. Appellant Brief due by 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 USBC Doc. 63, Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 USBC Doc. 58, Order Granting TitleMax's Motion to Confirm Termination or Absence of the Automatic Stay, #3 USBC Adversary Proceeding 18-33069-BPC Docket Sheet)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel v. Titlemax of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kisha Yvonne Daniel
Represented By: David Gerald Poston
Represented By: Michael Derek Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Butler
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Represented By: Sabrina Lee McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?