Thompson v. TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Appellant: Donna R. Thompson
Appellee: TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Case Number: 2:2019cv00860
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr., as presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, )
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy 8018(a), it is ORDERED that this appeal is set for submission, without oral argument, on 2/19/2020, with the appellant's opening brief due by 1/6/2020, the appellee's response brief due by 2/5/2020, and appellant's reply brief due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/2019. (wcl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal Copy of Designation of Appellee's Designation of Record on appeal which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designation of Items to be Included, #2 DE 1- Voluntary Petition, #3 DE 20- Amended Schedule A-B and C, #4 DE 21- Objection to Confirmation and Exhibits, #5 DE 24- Motion for Relief from Stay & Exhibits, #6 DE 27- Amended Motion for Relief from Stay, #7 DE 29- Exhibits, #8 DE 32- Motion to Consolidate, #9 DE 38- Objection to Motion to Consolidate, #10 DE 40- Response to Amended Motion for Relief from Stay, #11 DE 43- Reply to Reponse to Amended Motion for Relief from Stay, #12 DE 47- Exhibit 1-9, #13 DE 47- Response to Debtor's Motion to Compel, #14 DE 56- Supplemental Brief ad Exhibits, #15 18-32609 Certified Docket Sheet)(cnw, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Copy of Appellant's Designation of Record on appeal which was filed with US Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designations, #2 Appellant's Statement of Issues, #3 1. Voluntary Petition DE1, #4 - 2. Chapter 13 Plan DE2, #5 3. TitleMax Objection to Confirmation of Plan DE21, #6 4. TitleMax's Motion for Relief from Stay DE29, #7 5. Appellant's Amended Schedule D DE31, #8 6. Appellant's Motion to Compel Discovery DE41, #9 7. Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing DE50, #10 8. Appellant's Amended Schedules AB and C DE57, #11 9. Appellant's Amended Chapter 13 Plan DE58, #12 10. Hearing Transcript from April 18 2019 Evidentiary Hearing DE75, #13 11. TitleMax Post hearing brief DE79, #14 12. Thompson Post hearing brief DE80, #15 13. Memorandum Decision - Opinion DE81, #16 14. Order Granting Motion for Relief From Stay DE82, #17 15. P-1 Pawn ticket dated September 1 2018, #18 16. P-2 Automobile certificate of title dated October 29 2012, #19 17. P-3 Pawn receipt dated February 2 2016, #20 18. P-4 Transaction History Report, #21 19. D-1 Pawn ticket dated June 22 2012, #22 20. D-2 Pawn ticket dated Janaury 4 2016, #23 21. D-3 Pawn ticket dated March 16 2016, #24 22. D-4 69 pawn receipts from July 24 2012 through September 1 2018, #25 Docket Sheet (Certified))(cnw, ) Modified on 12/5/2019 to clarify as appellant's designation (cnw, ).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL of Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Donna R. Thompson. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-32609. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Granting Motion for Relief from Stay, #3 U.S. Bankruptcy Court Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(cnw, ) Modified on 12/11/2019 to edit text to reflect as Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donna R. Thompson
Represented By: David Gerald Poston
Represented By: Michael Derek Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TitleMax of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: David Anthony Butler
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Represented By: Sabrina Lee McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?