City of Brundidge, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Brundidge, Alabama
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Allergan PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Actavis, PLS and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00861
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Received email from OHND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; OHND case number assigned as 1:19-op-46128. (No pdf attached to this entry).(kh, )
December 5, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to clerk. (kh, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 25 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer order entered on 12/5/2015 by the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation transferring this action to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (kh, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by A.V. for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (kh, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Johnson & Johnson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (kh, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by CT Corporation for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (kh, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Paul S. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by D. Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Cephalon, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by M. Wyatt for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by C.S. for Actavis, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (kh, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Strubel, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Noramco, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Julie Buckner for TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for Purdue Pharma L.P., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for McKesson Corporation, served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (amf, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Julie Buckner for Actavis Pharma, Inc., served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (amf, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and CMRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Brundidge, Alabama. (kh, )
November 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Brundidge, Alabama. (no pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf)(kh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055643.), filed by City of Brundidge, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Brundidge, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David Lee Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Houston Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Brundidge, Alabama
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?