Parish v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Ed Parish, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph Headley, Jefferson Dunn, Jeremy A. Singleton, Kenny Waver and Grantt Culliver
Case Number: 2:2019cv00878
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alexander McKnight, Jr on behalf of Kenny Waver (McKnight, Thomas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Linch Jordan on behalf of Kenny Waver (Jordan, Albert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Bainbridge Robinson on behalf of Kenny Waver (Robinson, Ben)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ed Parish, Jr.; Jefferson Dunn waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Mujumdar, Anil)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Correction re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint &, #12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement, to attach corrected PDF documents to properly reflect the case number on the pleadings as "2:19-cv-878-MHT"; The case number was previously listed in error as "2:19-cv-78-MHT". (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #9 , #2 Main PDF to Document #12 )(amf, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Grantt Culliver, Joseph Headley, Jeremy A. Singleton, Kenny Waver re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Stewart, Joseph) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/11/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to properly reflect the case number as "2:19-cv-878-MHT"; The case number was previously listed in error as "2:19-cv-78-MHT") (amf, ). Modified on 12/11/2019 (amf, ).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint; the deadline for the dfts, other than Jefferson Dunn, to file responses to the complaint is extended to 2/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/11/2019. (amf, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Grantt Culliver, Joseph Headley, Kenny Waver, & Jeremy A. Singleton; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
December 10, 2019 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 MOTION - Attorney Carrie Ellis McCollum for Grantt Culliver, Joseph Headley, Jeremy A. Singleton, & Kenny Waver added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint by Grantt Culliver, Joseph Headley, Jeremy A. Singleton, Kenny Waver. (Stewart, Joseph) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/11/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to properly reflect the case number as "2:19-cv-878-MHT"; The case number was previously listed in error as "2:19-cv-78-MHT") (amf, ). Modified on 12/11/2019 (amf, ).
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ed Parish, Jr. Jeremy A. Singleton served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Mujumdar, Anil)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ed Parish, Jr. Kenny Waver served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Mujumdar, Anil)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ed Parish, Jr. Joseph Headley served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Mujumdar, Anil)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ed Parish, Jr. Grantt Culliver served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Mujumdar, Anil)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ed Parish, Jr re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Zarzaur, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ed Parish, Jr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jefferson Dunn, Grantt Culliver, Joseph Headley, Kenny Waver, & Jeremy A. Singleton and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grantt Culliver, Jefferson Dunn, Joseph Headley, Jeremy A. Singleton, Kenny Waver (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602055694), filed by Ed Parish, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
November 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ed Parish, Jr.. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parish v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Headley
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Represented By: Joseph Gordon Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy A. Singleton
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Represented By: Joseph Gordon Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Waver
Represented By: Ben Bainbridge Robinson
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Represented By: Thomas Alexander McKnight, Jr
Represented By: Albert Linch Jordan
Represented By: Joseph Gordon Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Represented By: Joseph Gordon Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Parish, Jr.
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar
Represented By: Gregory Martin Zarzaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?