McNeal v. American Credit Acceptance LLC et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Marcus Stefone McNeal
Defendant: Hendrick Motorsports, LLC, Hendrick Automotive Group, American Credit Acceptance LLC, Dan C. Breeden, Jr, Mark VanGeison, Joseph Riddick Hendrick, III, Todd Trawick, George Dean Johnson III ESA Trust, Curt Sidden, Jr, Timothy MacPhail, Susanna Presnell Johnson ESA Trust, Anarudh Agarwal, George Dean Johnson, Jr 2009 Revocable Trust and Jason Bynum
Case Number: 2:2019cv01079
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED as further set out in the order. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to defer service of process on the defendant until further order of the court, following the court's 1915(e) review of the plaintiff's complaint. As to the present status of this case, no additional action is required of the plaintiff at this time. No additional pleadings or filings are necessary to a determination of the issues before the court at this time, and plaintiff will be informed of any action undertaken by the court. A decision will be rendered in due course as the court's schedule permits. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/10/2020. (dmn, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/2/2020. (amf, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of the Pro Se Party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Marcus Stefone McNeal. (amf, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATION of the Pro Se Party for Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Marcus Stefone McNeal. (amf, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Marcus Stefone McNeal. (amf, )
December 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marcus Stefone McNeal. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Marcus Stefone McNeal. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP (Short Form), #2 Application IFP (Long Form))(amf, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anarudh Agarwal, American Credit Acceptance LLC, Dan C. Breeden, Jr, Jason Bynum, George Dean Johnson III ESA Trust, George Dean Johnson, Jr 2009 Revocable Trust, Joseph Riddick Hendrick, III, Hendrick Automotive Group, Hendrick Motorsports, LLC, Timothy MacPhail, Curt Sidden, Jr, Susanna Presnell Johnson ESA Trust, Todd Trawick, Mark VanGeison, filed by Marcus Stefone McNeal. (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. American Credit Acceptance LLC et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick Motorsports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrick Automotive Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Credit Acceptance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan C. Breeden, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark VanGeison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Riddick Hendrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Trawick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Dean Johnson III ESA Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Sidden, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy MacPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanna Presnell Johnson ESA Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anarudh Agarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Dean Johnson, Jr 2009 Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Stefone McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?