United States of America v. Chilsom et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bobbie Jean Chilsom
Garnishee: Family Dollar Stores
Case Number: 2:2019mc03855
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
0 Judge: Wallace Capel
1 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the government's unopposed motion to reduce the wage withholding amount under the #6 writ of garnishment is granted, and the amount of withholding is reduced from 25% of disposable earnings each pay period to 12% of disposable earnings each pay period; DIRECTING the clerk of court to mail a copy of this order to the garnishee. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/5/2019. Furnished Copy to garnishee. (am, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Modify Garnishment by United States of America. (DuBois, James)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment & #2 Writ of Garnishment, served on Family Dollar Stores on 3/1/2019. (alm, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed as to #2 Writ of Garnishment served on Bobbie Jean Chilsom on 3/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (djy, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America (DuBois, James) Modified on 2/21/2019 to clarify text to reflect as Corporate/conflict disclosure (qc/djy, ).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (kr, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Chilsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Jean Chilsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Family Dollar Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?