United States of America v. Murphy-Thomas et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Christi Murphy-Thomas
Garnishee: John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019mc03856
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christi Murphy-Thomas. (kh, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that the motion for permission to file a reply (doc. #12 ) be and is hereby GRANTED and the Defendant may file her reply on or before April 18, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/3/2019. (kh, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Permission to File A Reply to Government's Response to Order to Show Cause by Christi Murphy-Thomas. (kh, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America re #10 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Murphy)(DuBois, James)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED on or before March 29, 2019, the United States shall show cause why the #7 motion to dismiss should not be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/15/2019. (kh, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/8/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(kh, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment by Christi Murphy-Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(kh, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal by Christi Murphy-Thomas. (kh, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed by US Marshal as to #3 Writ of Garnishment served on Christi Murphy-Thomas on 2/22/2019. (kh, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed by US Marshal as to #3 Writ of Garnishment served on John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLC on 2/22/2019.(kh, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued and furnished to US Marshal for service on defendant and garnishee. (kh, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (kh, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Murphy, #2 Instructions to the Garnishee, #3 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #4 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #5 Garnishee Answer Form)(kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Murphy-Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Murphy-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?