ServisFirst Bank v. Jordan
Plaintiff: ServisFirst Bank
Defendant: David Duane Jordan
Garnishee: David Jordan and Co, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019mc03857
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Objection to re #3 MOTION Continuing Order of Condemnation filed by David Jordan and Co, Inc.. (Fritz, Michael)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr on behalf of David Jordan and Co, Inc. (Fritz, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Objection to re #3 MOTION Continuing Order of Condemnation filed by David Duane Jordan. (Fritz, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Continuing Order of Condemnation by ServisFirst Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Reynolds, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of the record re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (Attachments: #1 Doc 70 - Memorandum Decision, #2 Doc 71 - Order, #3 ALMB Certified Docket Sheet - Adv. Proc. 17-3092)(kr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference by ServisFirst Bank. (kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ServisFirst Bank v. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Duane Jordan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServisFirst Bank
Represented By: Ryan Roebuck Hendley
Represented By: Justin B. Little
Represented By: Robert Payne Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: David Jordan and Co, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?