In Re: Ohio Execution Protocol Litigation (MAG+)
Petitioner: Cleveland Jackson
In Re: Ohio Execution Protocol Litigation
Case Number: 2:2019mc03884
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
3 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that Movant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Doc. #1 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/27/2019. (kh, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Cleveland Jackson re #1 MOTION to Compel Movant Cleveland Jackson's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel (ECF No. 1) (Bohnert, Allen)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/13/2019. (am, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (djy, )
September 13, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Doyle, case reassigned: #1 MOTION to Compel (djy, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Order to Show Cause signed by Janice Nguyen for Attorney Marc Bass served on 8/15/2019. (am, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance With This Court's #4 Order by Cleveland Jackson (Bohnert, Allen) Modified on 8/14/2019 to add linkage to #4 and clarify text as reflected in pleading (am, ).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING that on or before 8/19/2019, the Alabama Department of Forensic Sciences shall SHOW CAUSE cause, if any there be, why the Motion to Compel Production should not be granted; DIRECTING the Clerk to mail acopy of this show cause order to the address listed for counsel for the Alabama Department of Forensic Sciences on page 21 in (Doc #1 ); further ORDERING Counsel for movant to send an electronic copy of this order to counsel for the Alabama Department of Forensic Sciences as soon as possible. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/13/2019. (Copy Mailed to Counsel for AL Dept of Forensic Sciences, as directed (am, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/5/19. (djy, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Jackson. (am, )
August 2, 2019 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Cleveland Jackson. (NO PDF attached - See doc #1 ). (am, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Subpoena Issued to Non-Party the Alabama Department of Forensic Sciences, filed by Cleveland Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Ohio Execution Protocol Litigation (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cleveland Jackson
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ohio Execution Protocol Litigation
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?