United States of America v. Hurry et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marcus Dupree Hurry
Garnishee: Root Staff Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019mc03889
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT as to Root Staff Corporation with 285 Form and service materials provided to US Marshal for service at new address. (dmn, ) (NO PDF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Joseph DuBois (DuBois, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 US Marshal ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Root Staff Corporation re #3 Writ of Garnishment, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (dmn, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 US Marshal ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Marcus Hurry re #3 Writ of Garnishment, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, served 9/4/2019. (dmn, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued; 285 Forms and service materials provided to US Marshal. (dmn, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (dmn, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #2 Instructions to the Garnishee, #3 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #4 Claim for Exemption Form)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hurry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Dupree Hurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Root Staff Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?