United States of America v. Nutt et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Glenn Edward Nutt
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019mc03903
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case. (bes, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder/Consolidation by Glenn Edward Nutt. (wcl, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Glenn Edward Nutt. (wcl, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Dissolve Writ of Garnishment by Glenn Edward Nutt. (wcl, )
December 19, 2019 MOTION for Hearing by Glenn Edward Nutt. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #5 for PDF) (wcl, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Claim for Exemption Form filed by Glenn Edward Nutt. (wcl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 US Marshals ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 11/26/2019 as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re: #3 Writ of Garnishment, #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (cnw, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued and furnished to USMS for service. (cnw, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (cnw, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee form)(cnw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #6 Affidavit) (cnw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nutt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Edward Nutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?