Brown v. U.S. Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Brown
Defendant: U.S. Foods, Inc., Chris Smith, David Hircsh and Michael Asbery
Case Number: 2:2020cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintif's Amended Complaint filed by Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc.. (Kays, Danielle)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as Presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (amf, )
February 14, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Capel: #15 MOTION TO DISMISS. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Scott Brown. (Johnston, Jamie)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Dft's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. #13 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/23/2020. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by any opposing party as to why the #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 2/13/2020; Dfts may file a reply on or before 2/20/2020; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 2/13/2020; DO NOT FILE THE CONSENT NOR REASSIGNMENT FORM ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/23/2020. (bes, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc.. (Geisler, Kimberly)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Filing Fee Received re #13 Motion for Kyle A. Petersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice: $75.00, receipt number 4602056379. (bes, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Kyle A. Petersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geisler, Kimberly) Modified on 1/21/2020 to add the attorney's name (bes, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2020 to attach a Certificate of Good Standing from another US District Court: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (bes, ).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Dft's #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, it is ORDERED that the motion is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 01/13/2020. (bes, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 Filing fee received re #7 Motion for Danielle M. Kays to Appear Pro Hac Vice : $ 75.00, receipt number 4602066290 (kh, )
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. #9 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is hereby GRANTED, and that, on or before January 21, 2020, Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/10/2020. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Amended Complaint by Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc.. (Geisler, Kimberly)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Scott Brown. (Johnston, Jamie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Danielle M. Kays to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geisler, Kimberly) Modified on 1/9/2020 to add the attorneys name. (kh, ).
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Michael Asbery, Scott Brown, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc. (bes, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by U.S. Foods, Inc.. (bes, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by David Hircsh. (bes, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Chris Smith. (bes, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael Asbery. (bes, )
January 3, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Scott Brown. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
January 3, 2020 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc., filed by Scott Brown. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
January 3, 2020 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc., filed by Scott Brown. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
January 3, 2020 COMPLAINT against Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc., filed by Scott Brown. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Asbery, David Hircsh, Chris Smith, U.S. Foods, Inc. from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-CV-2019-901247.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056214) (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 First Amended Complaint, #3 State Complaint, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B- State Court Record, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. U.S. Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Brown
Represented By: Jamie Austin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Represented By: Kyle A Petersen
Represented By: Danielle Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Represented By: Kyle A Petersen
Represented By: Danielle Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hircsh
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Represented By: Kyle A Petersen
Represented By: Danielle Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Asbery
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Represented By: Kyle A Petersen
Represented By: Danielle Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?