Warren v. Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Warren
Defendant: Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00083
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 8 TEXT ORDER - Attorney Khari M. Ferrell terminated. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw for Attorney Khari M. Ferrell. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/17/2020. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw for Khari M. Ferrell by Hunter Warfield, Inc.. (Gamble, Kara) Modified on 3/10/2020 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
March 5, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #5 ANSWER - Attorneys Kara Deal Gamble,Khari M. Ferrell for Hunter Warfield, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hunter Warfield, Inc.. (Scott, John)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant Hunter Warfield, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hunter Warfield, Inc..(Scott, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by C. G. for Hunter Warfield, Inc. served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. (bes, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hunter Warfield, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint. (bes, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mark Warren. (bes, )
February 4, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mark Warren. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hunter Warfield, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056609.), filed by Mark Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Warren
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Represented By: John Winston Scott
Represented By: Khari M. Ferrell
Represented By: Kara Deal Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?