Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Holt, McDuffee, and Ramsey L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Vicki Lawrenson, Barry R Holt, Jaques Jarry, Holt, Mcduffee, and Ramsey L.L.C. and Barry R. Holt
Case Number: 2:2020cv00108
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 Alias Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Vicki Lawrenson with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward". (amf, )
April 7, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #13 Order sent to Vicki Lawrenson was returned with the following notation: "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vicki Lawrenson re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Nix, Horace)
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jaques Jarry re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Nix, Horace)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Dfts Jaques Jarry & Vicki Lawrenson; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Dfts Jaques Jarry & Vicki Lawrenson. (amf, )
March 31, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #14 ANSWER - Attorney James Matthew Williams for Jaques Jarry & Vicki Lawrenson added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Jaques Jarry, Vicki Lawrenson.(Nix, Horace)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time & #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time, as further set out in order; it is ORDERED that the dfts shall file a responsive pleading on or before 4/24/2020; The corporate dft must do so through counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/24/2020. (amf, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Jaques Jarry and Vicki Lawrenson to File Answers by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Salter, Scott)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 Alias Summons issued as to Vicki Lawrenson; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Illegible for Vicki Lawrenson, served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (amf, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Barry R. Holt and Holt, McDuffee & Ramsey to File Answers by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Salter, Scott) Modified on 3/18/2020 to remove erroneous ex parte designation (amf, ).
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Jaques Jarry for Jaques Jarry, served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (amf, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Perrin Mims for Barry R. Holt, served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (amf, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Perrin Mims for Holt, McDuffee, and Ramsey L.L.C., served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (amf, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Salter, Scott)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barry R. Holt, Holt, McDuffee, and Ramsey L.L.C., Jaques Jarry, & Vicki Lawrenson; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plf Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (amf, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Barry R. Holt, Holt, McDuffee, and Ramsey L.L.C., Jaques Jarry, Vicki Lawrenson (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602056859), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Holt, McDuffee, and Ramsey L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Lawrenson
Represented By: Horace Earl Nix, Jr.
Represented By: James Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry R Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaques Jarry
Represented By: Horace Earl Nix, Jr.
Represented By: James Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt, Mcduffee, and Ramsey L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry R. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Meyers Salter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?