Dismukes v. Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashlee Smith Dismukes
Defendant: Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00130
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Busby, Jennifer)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Report was due on 4/13/2020. To date, no report has been filed. It is ORDERED that the parties must file their Rule 26(f) report on or before 4/22/2020. If the parties have not yet conferred, they may do so telephonically or via video conference. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/15/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/20/2020. (cnw, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.. (Shirley, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc..(Shirley, Elizabeth)
March 3, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashlee Smith Dismukes re #17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Leonard, Heather)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Def shall file a responsive pleading on or before 3/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/28/2020. (cnw, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ashlee Smith Dismukes; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01916. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER - Accordingly, Defendant's motion (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/24/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Wilkinson, Cynthia) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Hyundai Power Transformers USA, Inc. ("HPT"). Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response by February 5, 2020; HPT may reply by February 12, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/22/2020. (SJB) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] Modified on 2/26/2020 to reflect "NO pdf attached to this entry" (wcl, ).
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc. (Shirley, Elizabeth) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ingu Hwang on behalf of Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc (Hwang, Ingu) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley on behalf of Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc (Shirley, Elizabeth) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer shall now be due by January 21, 2020, the day after the Martin Luther King holiday. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 1/6/2020. (SJB)[Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] Modified on 2/26/2020 to reflect "NO pdf attached to this entry" (wcl, ).
January 6, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc answer due 1/21/2020. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc. filed by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc (Busby, Jennifer) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 1/3/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc. (Busby, Jennifer) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia F Wilkinson on behalf of Ashlee Smith Dismukes (Wilkinson, Cynthia) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (green card signed, not dated) (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Leonard, Heather) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3485384. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc, filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KEK). (Leonard, Heather) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
November 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc, filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dismukes v. Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley
Represented By: Jennifer Manasco Busby
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Smith Dismukes
Represented By: Cynthia Forman Wilkinson
Represented By: Heather Newsom Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?