Bank of Hope v. Dayk Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of Hope
Defendant: Dae Son Song, Kang Son Song, Dayk Enterprises, Inc., Kang Sun Song and Dayk Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Country Inn & Suites Montgomery East
Case Number: 2:2020cv00155
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION to Strike the answer and response in opposition to the motion to appoint a receiver is GRANTED to the extent that the answer and motion to appoint a receiver were filed by Dayk Enterprises, Inc., but in no other respect; Additionally, defendant Dayk Enterprises is cautioned that if it fails to appear and otherwise defend this action through counsel of record, default judgment may be entered against it; directing counsel for the plaintiff and the individual defendants are to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/8/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/29/2020. (djy, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike Response in Opposition, #12 Answer to Complaint (Motion to Strike Pro Se Answer and Opposition to Motion to Appoint Receiver) by Bank of Hope. (Taube, Gregory)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bank of Hope. Amendment to #11 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default . (Taube, Gregory)
April 7, 2020 Referred to clerk regarding #11 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (djy, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Bank of Hope against Dayk Enterprises, Inc. dba Country Inn & Suites Montgomery East, Dae Son Song and Kang Sun Song. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit as to Non-Military Service)(Taube, Gregory)
April 1, 2020 PRO SE OPPOSITION to plf's #2 MOTION to appoint receiver by Dayk Enterprises, Inc., Dae Son Song, Kang Sun Song. (NO PDF document attached to this notice (NO PDF document attached to this notice-see docket entry #12 ). (djy, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dayk Enterprises, Inc., Dae Son Song, Kang Sun Song.(djy, ) Modified on 4/7/2020 to correct filed date as 4/1/2020 (qc/djy, ). Modified on 4/29/2020 to reflect STRICKEN as to on behalf of Dayk Enterprises, Inc. pursuant to #15 order)(qc/djy, ).
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bank of Hope re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Taube, Gregory) Modified on 3/17/2020 to remove the link from the #1 Complaint (amf, ).
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bank of Hope; Kang Sun Song served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Taube, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bank of Hope; Dae Son Song served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Taube, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bank of Hope; Dayk Enterprises, Inc. served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Taube, Gregory)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bank of Hope; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Bank of Hope. (djy, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dayk Enterprises, Inc., Dae Son Song, Kang Sun Song and returned to counsel for personal service on defendant. (djy, ) .
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to appoint receiver filed by Bank of Hope. (djy, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to appoint receiver by Bank of Hope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-proposed order)(djy, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dayk Enterprises, Inc., Dae Son Song, Kang Sun Song ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057125.), filed by Bank of Hope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 fee receipt)(djy, ) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Hope v. Dayk Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dae Son Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kang Son Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayk Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kang Sun Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayk Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Country Inn & Suites Montgomery East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Hope
Represented By: Gregory Michael Taube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?