Williams v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Reginald Williams
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00159
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Collier Wilson on behalf of Velocity Investments, LLC (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/5/2020. The parties are reminded that each has the right to consent or request reassignment. The parties should now confirm their selection in writing. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/1/2020 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/27/2020. (dmn, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. (dmn, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Velocity Investments, LLC. (Friedman, Barry)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Velocity Investments, LLC.(Friedman, Barry)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Allen Friedman on behalf of Velocity Investments, LLC (Friedman, Barry)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Kelly Webster for Velocity Investments, LLC, served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (amf, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Velocity Investments, LLC. (dmn, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Reginald Williams. (dmn, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Reginald Williams. (dmn, )
March 6, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Reginald Williams. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 )
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Velocity Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057128.), filed by Reginald Williams. (Attachments: #1 Request for Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Williams
Represented By: Wallace Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Collier Wilson
Represented By: Barry Allen Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?