Sullivan v. Gaddick et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: William L. Sullivan
Defendant: Lynn Head, Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Gaddick, Clifford Walker and Charles Graddick
Case Number: 2:2020cv00255
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Graddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker. (Mest, Laura)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Beck Mest on behalf of Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Graddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker (Mest, Laura)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend #2 Inmate 1983 Complaint, by William L. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(cwl, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 Received partial Filing fee: $ 18.00, receipt number 4602058048 (djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Clifford Walker served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Lynn Head served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Charles Graddick served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Terry Davis served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and order or procedure signed by D Cagle for Joel Barnes served on (no date given), answer due 7/1/2020. (djy, )
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT and ANSWER on or before 7/1/2020, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants; mailed with complaint to General Counsel for ADOC and General Counsel for the Alabama Board of Pardons & Paroles. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/20/20. (djy, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 Received initial partial Filing fee: $ 29.90, receipt number 4602057917. (djy, )
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION considering #4 Motion to Amend as a motion for status; granting #4 Motion for status to the extent addressed in this order; Plf is advised: (i) this case is pending on his complaint; (ii) Plaintiff is under order entered 4/24/2020, to file an initial filing fee of $29.90 by 5/15/2020, or the court will recommend this action be dismissed for his failure to comply with the order of the court (see Doc. #3 ); and (3) pending receipt of the initial filing fee, the court will enter any further order or Recommendation as deemed necessary and appropriate; directing the Clerk is to furnish Plf with a copy of the docket sheet for this action. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/18/2020. Mailed with copy of docket sheet, as directed. (djy, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to Amend plf's #2 Inmate 1983 Complaint, by William L. Sullivan. (djy, ). Added MOTION for status on 5/18/2020 pursuant to #5 order (qc/djy, ).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $29.90 be paid on or before 5/15/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full; granting #1 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order, as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Red Eagle Honor Farm. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/24/2020. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Joel Barnes, Terry Davis, Charles Gaddick, Lynn Head, Clifford Walker, filed by William L. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(hrs, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by William L. Sullivan. (hrs, ) Modified on 4/22/2020 to clarify text to removed incorrect motion event docketed in error (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Gaddick et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Head
Represented By: Laura Beck Mest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Barnes
Represented By: Laura Beck Mest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Davis
Represented By: Laura Beck Mest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Gaddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Walker
Represented By: Laura Beck Mest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Graddick
Represented By: Laura Beck Mest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?