Christy v. Garmin USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Christy
Defendant: Garmin USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00256
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, )
June 9, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Walker: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 9, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S TEXT ORDER (DOC # 15) - Attorney Randall Stark Haynes terminated. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Randall S. Haynes. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/9/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that plf shall respond to the #9 MOTION to Dismiss on or before 6/22/2020; Dft may file a reply on or before 6/29/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/9/2020. (wcl, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conventional Filing by Garmin USA, Inc. re #12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Not Scanned)(wcl, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Garmin USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Anthony Hancox Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Jamie Carnathan Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Video; Exhibit to Jamie Carnathan Declaration, #4 Exhibit B - Web Page; Exhibit to Jamie Carnathan Declaration, #5 Exhibit C - Web Page; Exhibit to Jamie Carnathan Declaration, #6 Exhibit D - Video; Exhibit to Jamie Carnathan Declaration, #7 Exhibit E - Web Page; Exhibit to Jamie Carnathan Declaration, #8 Exhibit F - Web Page; Exhibit to Jamie Carnathan Declaration)(Earnhardt, John)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Jason Christy. (Haynes, Randall)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Responsive Pleading to the extent that dft shall respond to the complaint on or before 5/29/2020; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/21/2020, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/19/2020. (wcl, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Garmin USA, Inc.. (Earnhardt, John)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Garmin USA, Inc. (kh, )
May 13, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #6 MOTION - Attorney Mary Mangan for Garmin USA, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Garmin USA, Inc.. (Earnhardt, John)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Garmin USA, Inc.. (Earnhardt, John)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Garmin USA, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (wcl, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Jason Christy. (wcl, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Garmin USA, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint and #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jason Christy. (wcl, )
April 14, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jason Christy. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garmin USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057599.), filed by Jason Christy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christy v. Garmin USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Christy
Represented By: Taylor Alan Pharr
Represented By: Randall Stark Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin USA, Inc.
Represented By: John Aaron Earnhardt
Represented By: Mary Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?