Ballard v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Arthur Henry Ballard
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00260
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/19/2020; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 6/15/2020; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/10/2020. (cwl, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) General Motors LLC. (cwl, )
May 26, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #12 ANSWER - Attorney Michael Lester Bell, Joel Chandler Bailey, II for General Motors LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
May 26, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by General Motors LLC. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #12 for pdf) (cwl, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by General Motors LLC. (Sanchez, Rachelle)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Sanchez, Rachelle)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for C. Tab Turner, Damon Singleton, Austin Kurtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/22/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Received Pro Hac Filing fee for Austin Kurtz re: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602057914. (cwl, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Received Pro Hac Filing fee for Damon Singleton re: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602057916. (cwl, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 Received Pro Hac Filing fee for C. Tab Turner re: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602057915. (cwl, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for C. Tab Turner, Damon Singleton, Austin Kurtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Henry Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Turner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Singleton, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Kurtz)(cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2020: #4 corrected certificate of service) (cwl, ).
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #4 Summons signed by Kelly Webster for General Motors LLC served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (cnw, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Arthur Henry Ballard re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Pittman, Adam)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Arthur Henry Ballard. (cnw, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Arthur Henry Ballard; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cnw, )
April 15, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arthur Henry Ballard. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057600.), filed by Arthur Henry Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Henry Ballard
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Adam Wade Pittman
Represented By: Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr.
Represented By: Tab Turner
Represented By: James Curtis Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?