Hatcher v. United States of America (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Daniel Lamar Hatcher
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00268
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this action is dismissed without prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(amf, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) Petitioner's #7 Objections are OVERRULED; 2) The #4 Recommendation is ADOPTED; and 3) Petitioner's 28 USC 2241 motion is DISMISSED without prejudice; Final judgment will be entered separately; A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/16/2020. (amf, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION (Reply) to #4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Daniel Lamar Hatcher. (bes, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER construing doc #5 as a MOTION for Extension of Time; it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The #5 motion for extension of time is DENIED to the extent the petitioner seeks additional time to prepare his in forma pauperis application as this court previously granted him leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this civil action (Doc. #3 ); 2) The #5 motion for extension of time is GRANTED to the extent the petitioner seeks additional time to file objections to the #4 Recommendation; 3) The plf is GRANTED an extension from 5/19/2020 to and including 6/8/2020 to file objections to the Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/13/2020. (amf, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION of Postponement Due to COVID-19 in All Proceedings by Daniel Lamar Hatcher, CONSTRUED as a MOTION for Extension of Time, pursuant to the Court's #6 Order (amf, ) Modified on 5/13/2020 (amf, ).
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge 1) that the #2 28 USC 2241 petition pending before the court be DENIED because this court is without jurisdiction to consider this petition and the interest of justice does not warrant a 28 USC 1631 transfer of this case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi, and 2) that this case be summarily DISMISSED; Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/4/2020. (amf, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the petitioner is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this civil action. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/27/2020. (amf, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Daniel Lamar Hatcher. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(amf, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER, entered in 2:09-cr-00081-WKW: DIRECTING the Clerk to strike Dft Daniel Lamar Hatcher's pro se "Motion to Modify Credit Time" pursuant to 18 USC 3585(b), open a new civil action under 28 USC 2241, and docket this same motion in the newly opened civil action; also DIRECTING the Clerk to assign the newly opened civil action to the magistrate judge and district judge to whom the instant case is assigned and refer the case to the appropriate magistrate judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/21/2020. (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatcher v. United States of America (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lamar Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?