Cobble v. US Government et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Defendant: Hamilton County Tennessee Government, Johnny Wayne Plemons, Jr., Georgia Department of Corrections, Robert Neeley, Karen Darlene Castleberry, Cobb GA Sheriff Department and US Government
Case Number: 2:2020cv00273
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Daniel Eric Cobble. (djy, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) Cobble's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED; and 2) This case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Cobble's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees upon initiating the case; Objections to R&R due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/1/2020. (bes, )
April 21, 2020 Assignment of Staff Attorney Willoughby, Mullikin assigned previously in error. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Daniel Eric Cobble. (es, )
April 21, 2020 MOTION for Miscellaneous Court Action by Daniel Eric Cobble. (NO PDF document attached to this notice - See Docket entry #1 ). (es, ).
April 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Eric Cobble. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Karen Darlene Castleberry, Cobb GA Sheriff Department, Georgia Department of Corrections, Hamilton County Tennessee Government, Robert Neeley, Johnny Wayne Plemons, Jr, US Government, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble.(es, ) Modified on 4/29/2020 to remove erroneous text (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble v. US Government et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Tennessee Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Wayne Plemons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Darlene Castleberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb GA Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Eric Cobble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?