Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation v. Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00300
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts Four, Six, and Eight of Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Stephen Wells, #2 Exhibit B - Michael Bownes Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Draft AMIC's First RFPs to Munich)(Smith, John)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion to dismiss (doc. no. #7 ) is set for submission, without oral argument, on 7/2/2020, with any opposition brief due by 6/25/2020, and any reply to the opposition due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/4/2020. (cwl, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #5 ANSWER - Attorney John Kevin Pocus for Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts Four, Six, and Eight of Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation's Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.. (Stockham, Connie)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.. (Stockham, Connie)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Munich Reinsurance America, Inc..(Stockham, Connie)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #3 Summons signed by William H. A. for Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (cwl, )
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (amf, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (cnw, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Munich Reinsurance America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602057812.), filed by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 receipt)(cnw, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation v. Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munich Reinsurance America, Inc.
Represented By: Connie Ray Stockham
Represented By: John Kevin Pocus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John Garland Smith
Represented By: Aria Bianca Allan
Represented By: Steven C Corhern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?