Mortgage Corporation of the South v. Bozeman
Appellee: Judith Lacy Bozeman
Appellant: Mortgage Corporation of the South
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Case Number: 2:2020cv00403
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Clerk's Transmittal of Appellant's & Appellee's Designation of Record on Appeal, which was filed with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record and Statement of Issues, #2 DE 1 - Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, #3 DE 6 - Clerk's Notice of Deficiency of Summary of Assets and Liabilities, #4 DE 17 - Schedules, #5 DE 18 - Chapter 13 Plan, #6 DE 24 - Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, #7 DE 26 - First Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #8 DE 33 - Trustee's Summary of Chapter 13 Plan and Request for Order Confirming Plan, #9 DE 34 - Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan, #10 DE 48 - Notice of Final Cure Payment, #11 DE 49 - Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments, #12 DE 50 - Notice of Final Requirements Necessary for Discharge, #13 DE 51 - MCS's Response to Notice of Final Cure and Notice of Completion, #14 DE 56 - Trustee's Response to Creditor's Response, #15 DE 59 - MCS's Supplemental Response, #16 DE74 - Rule 9007 Motion to Declare Lien Satisfied in Chapter 13 Case, #17 DE 76 - MCS's Objection to Debtor's Motion to Deem Lien Satisfied, MCS's Motion to Lift Stay, #18 DE 80 - Debtor's Response to MCS's Brief, #19 DE 81 - MCS's reply to Debtor's Response to MCS's Brief, #20 DE98 - Transcript for Hearing held on 2/24/2020, #21 DE101 - Memorandum Decision Authored by the Honorable William Sawyer, #22 DE 102 - Order Dated 6/9/2020 Signed by Honorable William Sawyer, #23 DE 103 - Notice of Appeal Filed by MCS, #24 DE 104 - Text Only Docket Entry, #25 DE 105 - BNC Certificate of Service of order (DE 101) issued 6/11/2020, #26 DE 106 - BNC Certificate of Service of Order (DE 102) issued 6/12/2020, #27 Appellee's Designation of Record (Debtor), #28 Amended Appellee's Designation of Record (Debtor), #29 DE 1 - Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, #30 DE 9 - Withdrawn - Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by MCS, #31 DE 15 - Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay, #32 DE 17 - Schedules, #33 DE 18 - Chapter 13 Plan, #34 DE 20 - Notice of Withdrawal, #35 DE 24 - Trustee's Objection to Confirmation, #36 DE 26 - First Amended Plan, #37 DE 33 - Trustee's Summary of Confirmed Plan and Request for Confirmation, #38 DE 34 - Order Confirming Plan, #39 DE 42 - Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments by MCS, #40 DE 43 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, #41 DE 45 - Notice of Evidentiary Hearing, #42 DE 46 - Order of Motion to Dismiss, #43 DE 48 - Notice of Final Cure Payment, #44 DE 49 - Completion of Plan Payments, #45 DE 50 - Notice of Final Discharge Requirements, #46 DE 51 - Response to Notice of Final Cure and Objection to Trustee's Notice, #47 DE 54 - Notice of Hearing of Notice of Final Cure, #48 DE 56 - Trustee's Response to Creditor's Resposne to Notice of Final Cure, #49 DE 57 - Motion for Relief From Stay and Co-Debtor Stay, #50 DE 60 - Supplemental Response to Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments, #51 DE 60 - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by MCS, #52 DE 63 - Notice of Evidentiary Hearing on Notice of Final Cure, #53 DE 64 - Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief From Stay, #54 DE 69 - Debtor's Motion to Extend Time, #55 DE 72 - Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #56 DE 74 - Rule 9007 Motion to Declare Lien Satisfied, #57 DE 75 - Briefing Schedule, #58 DE 76 - Objection to DEbtor's Motion to Deem Lien Satisfied and Brief in Support of MCS's Objections, #59 DE 78 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Deem Lien Satisfied, #60 DE 80 - Debtor's Response to MCS Brief, #61 DE 81 - Reply to Debtor's Brief, #62 DE 82 - Objection to Claim 2 (MCS), #63 DE 83 - Debtor's Motion to Extend Time, #64 DE 84 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Extend Time, #65 DE 86 - Response to Objection to Claim 2, #66 DE 87 - Notice of Hearing on Objection to Claim, #67 DE 89 - Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #68 DE 92 - Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing, #69 DE 101 - Memorandum Decision, #70 DE 102 - Order, #71 DE 103 - Notice of Appeal, #72 DE 107 - Transmittal of Notice of Appeal, #73 DE 109 - Appellant Designation of Record on Appeal, #74 DE 111 - Rule 9007 Motion for Discharge, #75 DE 112 - Trustee's Appellee Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #76 Claim 2 Filed by MCS, #77 Amended Claim 2 Filed by MCS, #78 Amended Claim 2 Filed by MCS, #79 Docket Sheet for Case 16-32469, #80 Court Claims Register for Case 16-32469, #81 Transcript of Hearing 6/13/2019, #82 Transcript of Hearing 6/20/2019, #83 Transcript of Hearing 9/12/2019, #84 Transcript of Hearing 10/17/2019, #85 Transcript of Hearing 1/9/2020, #86 Transcript of Hearing 2/24/2020, #87 Appellee's Designations and Statement of Issues, #88 DE 1 - Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, #89 DE 5 - Meeting of Creditors, #90 DE 9 - Withdrawn - Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by MCS, #91 DE 15 - Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay, #92 DE 17 - Schedules, #93 DE18 - Chapter 13 Plan, #94 DE 20 - Notice of Withdrawal, #95 DE 24 - Trustee's Objection to Confirmation, #96 DE 26 - First Amended Plan, #97 DE 33 - Trustee's Summary of Confirmed Plan and Request for Confirmation, #98 DE 34 - Order Confirming Plan, #99 DE 42 - Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments by MCS, #100 DE 43 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, #101 DE 45 - Notice of Evidentiary Hearing, #102 DE 46 - Order on Motion to Dismiss, #103 DE 48 - Notice of Final Cure Payment, #104 DE 49 - Completion of Plan Payments, #105 DE 50 - Notice of Final Discharge Requirements, #106 DE 51 - Response to Notice of Final Cure and Objection to Trustee's Notice, #107 DE 54 - Notice of Hearing on Notice of Final Cure, #108 DE 56 - Trustee's Response to Credito's Response to Notice of Final Cure, #109 DE 57 - Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay, #110 DE 60 - Supplemental Response to Trustee's Notice of COmpletion of Plan Payments, #111 DE 60 - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by MCS, #112 DE 63 - Notice of Evidentiary Hearing on Notice of Final Cure, #113 DE 64 - Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay, #114 DE 69 - Debtor's Motion to Extend Time, #115 DE 72 - Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #116 DE 74 - Rule 9007 Motion to Declare Lien Satisfied, #117 DE 75 - Briefing Schedule, #118 DE 76 - Objection to Debtor's Motion to Deem Lien Satisfied and Brief in Support of MCS's Objection, #119 DE 78 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Deem Lien Satisfied, #120 DE 80 - Debtor's Response to MCS Brief, #121 DE 81 - Reply to Debtor's Brief, #122 DE 82 - Objection to Claim 2 (MCS), #123 DE 83 - Debtor's Motion to Extend Time, #124 DE 84 - Notice of Hearing on Motion to Extend Time, #125 DE 86 - Response to Objection to Claim 2, #126 DE 87 - Notice of Hearing on Objection to Claim, #127 DE 89 - Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #128 DE 92 - Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing, #129 DE 101 - Memorandum Decision, #130 DE 102 - Order, #131 DE 103 - Notice of Appeal, #132 DE 107 - Transmittal of Notice of Appeal, #133 DE 109 - Appellant Designation of Record on Appeal, #134 DE 111 - Rule 9007 Motion for Discharge, #135 DE 112 - Appellee's Designation of Items and Statement of Issues, #136 Claim 2 filed by MCS, #137 Amended Claim 2 filed by MCS, #138 Amended Claim 2 filed by MCS, #139 Docket Sheet for Case 16-32469, #140 Court Register for Case 16-32469, #141 Transcript of Hearing 6/13/2019, #142 Transcript of Hearing 6/20/2020, #143 Transcript of Hearing 9/12/2020, #144 Transcript of Hearing 10/17/2019, #145 Transcript of Hearing 1/9/2020, #146 Transcript of Hearing 2/24/2020, #147 BK Case 16-32469 Certified Docket Sheet, #148 Notice of Appeal, #149 Order on Motion for Relief from Stay)(bes, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sabrina L. McKinney. (McKinney, Sabrina)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Clerk's TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; Bankruptcy Court Case No. 16-32469. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 USBC Order, #3 USBC Certified Docket Sheet)(bes, ) Modified on 6/18/2020 to reflect the Bankruptcy number as a case number rather than an Adversary Proceeding (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortgage Corporation of the South v. Bozeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Judith Lacy Bozeman
Represented By: Charles Edward Grainger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mortgage Corporation of the South
Represented By: Burton W Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Sabrina L. McKinney
Represented By: Sabrina Lee McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?