Smith v. Walmart Inc. et al (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Peter James Smith
Defendant: Walmart Store #00938 and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00406
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to stay service of the case pending the court's obligatory review of the complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 7/21/2020. (wcl, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Peter James Smith re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (kh, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Stephen Michael Doyle for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/18/2020. (wcl, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Peter James Smith; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Attachment)(wcl, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter James Smith. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP Short Form)(wcl, )
June 15, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Peter James Smith. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #00938, filed by Peter James Smith. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Walmart Inc. et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store #00938
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?