Johnson v. Neptune Technology Group, Inc. (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Marcus Johnson
Defendant: Neptune Technology Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00419
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
2 Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) and Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (Doc. #6 ) are DENIED as further set out in the order. (2) Plaintiff shall pay the civil filing fee in full on or before 8/21/2020 as further set out in the order. (3) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to stay service of process pending further notice from the Court. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/21/2020. (dmn, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff Marcus Johnson; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. as Presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case. (amf, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit (Long Form) by Marcus Johnson (dmn, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 7/14/2020, Plf shall amend his pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by completing and filing the court's long-form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. The Clerk's Office is directed to provide Plf with a copy of the long-form application along with this Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/30/2020. (long-form mailed as directed)(cwl, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to U.S. Magistrate Judge Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher on 6/29/2020. (amf, )
June 29, 2020 (STRICKEN - ENTERED IN ERROR) Motions No Longer Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Capel: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) Modified on 6/29/2020 (amf, ).
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement mailed to Marcus Johnson; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Marcus Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(amf, )
June 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marcus Johnson. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neptune Technology Group, Inc., filed by Marcus Johnson.(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Neptune Technology Group, Inc. (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neptune Technology Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?