J.D.P. v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: J. D. P.
Defendant: Melissa B. Snowden, Lesa Keith, David Hodge, Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, Kreshay Monique Thomas Caswell, W. Durden Dean, Arica Watkins-Smith, Ann Roy Moore, Robert Porterfield and Montgomery County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2020cv00420
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Summons Issued as to David Hodge, Kreshay Monique Thomas Caswell and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, )
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ann Roy Moore. (Marsh, John)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: This action was reassigned to the undersigned on 7/9/2020 (Doc. #14 ). Prior to the reassignment, Judge Capel entered a two-part order (Doc. #13 ), which included a directive for Plaintiff to advise the court in writing by 7/23/2020, concerning the status of service on two of the defendants. To date, Plaintiff has not complied with this directive. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before 8/20/2020, Plaintiff shall file a notice concerning the status of perfecting service on Defendants Kreshay Monique Thomas Caswell and David Hodge. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/6/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cwl, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith. (Seale, James)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by J. D. P. re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J. D. P.. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by J. D. P.. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Deadline; it is ORDERED that, on or before 7/30/2020, Plaintiff shall file a written response and show cause why Defendants' #11 , #12 motions to dismiss should not be granted. Defendants may file replies on or before 8/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/23/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to J. D. P.; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Deadline re #13 Order by J. D. P.. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 7/22/2020 to add link to order (cwl, ).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr., as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cwl, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 7/23/2020, Plf shall file a written responses and show cause why the #11 , #12 motions should not be granted; Defs may file replies on or before 7/30/2020; It is further ORDERED that, on or before 7/23/2020, Plf shall file a notice concerning the status of perfecting service on the two defs who have not been served with a copy of the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/9/2020. (cwl, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Capel: #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement, #11 MOTION to Dismiss. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith. (Seale, James). Added Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/9/2020 (cwl, ). Modified on 7/9/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Ann Roy Moore. (Marsh, John)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed by Defs Montgomery County Board of Education, Lesa Keith, W. Durden Dean, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, Mary Briers, Melissa B. Snowden, Robert Porterfield, and Arica Watkins-Smith (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED. The above Defs may file a pleading responsive to Plf's Complaint on or before 7/8/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/25/2020. (cwl, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint, [Unopposed] by Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith. (Seale, James)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the #6 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. Def Moore may file a pleading responsive to Plf's Complaint on or before 7/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/24/2020. (cwl, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DEF) Ann Roy Moore. (cwl, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Enlargement of Time by Ann Roy Moore. (Marsh, John)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ann Roy Moore. (Marsh, John)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Warren Marsh on behalf of Ann Roy Moore (Marsh, John)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF & 8 of 11 DEFS) Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, J. D. P., Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith. (cwl, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith. (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: #1 corrected certificate of service) (cwl, ).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 03-CV-20-900652.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058285) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 receipt) (cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: #6 corrected signature page) (cwl, ).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT against Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, David Hodge, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Ann Roy Moore, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Kreshay Monique Thomas Caswell, Arica Watkins-Smith, filed by J. D. P. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf)(cwl, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Mary Briers, Eleanor Lewis Dawkins, W. Durden Dean, Lesa Keith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Robert Porterfield, Melissa B. Snowden, Arica Watkins-Smith re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by J. D. P. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.D.P. v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa B. Snowden
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesa Keith
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Briers
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Lewis Dawkins
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreshay Monique Thomas Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Durden Dean
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arica Watkins-Smith
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Roy Moore
Represented By: John Warren Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Porterfield
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Board of Education
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. D. P.
Represented By: Gwendolyn Thomas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?