Ballard v. Saul
Plaintiff: Eric Ballard
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00506
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Order signed by illegible for US Attorney General William Barr, served on 7/27/2020. (bes, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Order signed by Social Security Administration for Andrew Saul, served on 7/24/2020. (bes, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint and #2 Order signed by Niarchos Wright for SSA Office of Regional Chief Council served on 7/24/2020. (wcl, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons, #1 Complaint, & #2 Order signed by Yasmine Smith for U.S. Attorney served on 7/23/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (kh, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, Social Security Office of Regional Counsel, and U.S. Attorney General; mailed CMRRR with a copy of the #1 Complaint and #2 Order. (bes, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER Social Security Complaint within 90 days after the date of service of the complaint; plf to file brief in support within 40 days of filing of the answer; dft's reply brief and administrative record due within 30 days of brief filing; Copies mailed to counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/21/2020. (wcl, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602058603.), filed by Eric Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee)(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ballard
Represented By: Carl Steven Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?