Moore v. McGriff (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: William Larry Moore
Defendant: Glenn McGriff
Case Number: 2:2020cv00511
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $24.40 be paid on or before on or before August 14, 2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Hamilton Aged and Infirmed Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 7/24/2020. (furn: calendar, acct clerk)(kh, )
July 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Adams: #2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis. (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 6:20-cv-00116. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/24/2020 to correct filed date as 7/23/2020 (qc/djy, ).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the magistrate judge's report and ACCEPTS his recommendation and this action is transferred to the Middle District of Alabama; original electronic record will be unloaded to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/13/2020. (AHI ) [Transferred from alnd on 7/24/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate judge that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Alabama; objections due within 14 days from the date the R&R in entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 6/23/2020. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 7/24/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Larry Moore. (AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 7/24/2020.] .
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 INMATE 1983 COMPLAINT against Glenn McGriff filed by William Larry Moore.(AHI) [Transferred from alnd on 7/24/2020.] .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. McGriff (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Larry Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn McGriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?