Rivers v. Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC
Plaintiff: Keith Rivers
Defendant: Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00559
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrison, Alicia)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020. Any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/10/2020 as further set out in the order. If a party elects to complete the form requesting reassignment to a district judge, counsel must complete the attached form and mail it to the Clerk's Office. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/13/2020. (dmn, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC.(Harrison, Alicia)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC. (Harrison, Alicia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for ALL PARTIES. (amf, )
August 3, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Keith Rivers. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF) (amf, )
August 3, 2020 COMPLAINT against Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC, filed by Keith Rivers. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 - 1 for PDF)(amf, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, AL, case number 03-CV-2020-900844.00. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 4602058888) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Rivers
Represented By: Adam Shea Gober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversicare of Montgomery, LLC
Represented By: Reed Robertson Bates
Represented By: Alicia Medders Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?