Malone v. Parker (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: John Willie Malone, Jr.
Defendant: Lt. Parker
Case Number: 2:2020cv00599
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. Parker, filed by John Willie Malone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts)(dmn, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 9/25/2020, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as further set out in the order. To aid Plaintiff in filing a response to this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. The court will consider those claims set forth in the amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/11/2020. Copy with 1983 complaint form mailed to Plaintiff as directed.(dmn, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 8.67, receipt number 4602059305 (dmn, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $8.67 be paid on or before 9/8/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Staton Correctional Facility. Finally, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall immediately inform the court and Defendant if counsel has appeared on behalf of Defendant counsel of record of any change in his address as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/18/2020. (dmn, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Willie Malone, Jr. (hrs, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. Parker, filed by John Willie Malone, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Parker (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Willie Malone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?