Cliff v. Hines (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Steve T. Cliff
Defendant: Lt. Hines
Case Number: 2:2020cv00601
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order of the Court entered on this day adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kh, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED as follows: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. #3 ) is ADOPTED. 2. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. 3. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing and administrative fees upon initiation of his case. A final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 10/13/2020. (kh, )
October 13, 2020 No objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED; and 2. Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension from September 3, 2020, to and including October 5, 2020, to file his objections. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/9/2020. (kh, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Steve T. Cliff. (kh, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff (Doc. #2 ) be DENIED. 2. This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case. Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/20/2020. (kh, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 IFP Declaration, #2 Affidavit)(imm, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Lt. Hines, filed by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 Formal Complaint)(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cliff v. Hines (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve T. Cliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?