Cliff v. Means (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Steve T. Cliff
Defendant: Mrs. Means
Case Number: 2:2020cv00602
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(am, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that as follows: 1. the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. the #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED; 3. this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for the Plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon the initiation of this case; A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 9/29/2020. (am, )
September 15, 2020 NO Objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by the plaintiff be DENIED; 2) This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for the plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/25/2020. (am, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 IFP Declaration, #2 Affidavit)(hrs, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Mrs. Means, filed by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 Formal Complaint)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cliff v. Means (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve T. Cliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?