Cliff v. Smith (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Steve T. Cliff
Defendant: Officer Smith
Case Number: 2:2020cv00603
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the #6 memorandum opinion entered today, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted. (2) Plf's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. no. #2 ) is denied. (3) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case. No costs are taxed. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cwl, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2020. (cwl, )
October 14, 2020 No objections filed to the #3 recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that: 1) Plf's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is GRANTED; and 2) Plf is GRANTED an extension from 9/3/2020, to and including 10/5/2020, to file his objections, as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/9/2020. (bes, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to the #3 Recommendation by Steve T. Cliff. (bes, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plf be DENIED; 2) This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plf's failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/20/2020. (bes, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 IFP Declaration, #2 Affidavit) (imm, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Smith, filed by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 Formal Complaint)(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cliff v. Smith (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve T. Cliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?