Kister v. Jones (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Case Number: 2:2020cv00606
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
2 Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #7 Order signed by illegible for Patrice Richie Jones served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (wcl, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before October 19, 2020; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendant and General Counsel for the Alabama Department of Corrections. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/8/2020. (kh, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that: 1. This motion be and is hereby GRANTED to the extent addressed in this order. 2. The provision set forth in the order entered on August 20, 2020 (Doc. #3 ) which requires payment of an initial partial filing fee is VACATED. 3. The remaining directives set forth in the August 20, 2020 order, including those requiring payment of the filing fee as funds become available to the plaintiff (Doc. #3 at p.2, 1 2), remain in full force and effect. The clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/8/2020. (kh, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to pay initial partial filing fee when funds available by John Andrew Kister. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(bes, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (VACATED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #6 ORDER) ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $37.97 be paid on or before September 10, 2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/20/2020. (furn: cashier and account clerk)(kh, ) Modified on 9/8/2020 (kh, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by John Andrew Kister. (imm, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Patrice Richie Jones, filed by John Andrew Kister. (imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Jones (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Andrew Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?