CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company v. Mayflower Investments, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Mayflower Investments, LLC, Vakita Ragland, Demecia Wright, Ella Goldsmith, Angela Goldsmith, Talitha Smith, Latasha Wilson, James Davis, Frank Arrington, Michelle London, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ashley Williams, Rebecca Smith, Jerome Goldsmith, Laura Johnson, Shayalia Bradford, Johnnie Goldsmith, Patricia Ann Wilson, Asheia Goode, Margaret Daniel, Marcus Quinn, Pracey Gray and Melanie Blue
Case Number: 2:2020cv00614
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel, Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, Demecia Wright.(Hudson, Charles) Modified on 9/18/2020 to remove incorrectly selected filer(am, ).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING the #7 Motion for Admission of Amy E. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/1/2020. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Pro Hac Filing fee received re: #7 Motion for Amy E. Johnson $75.00, receipt number 4602059217. (am, ) Modified on 9/1/2020 to add attorney's name (am, ).
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel, James Davis, Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, Demecia Wright re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,,. (Hudson, Charles)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel, Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, & Demecia Wright; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel, Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, & Demecia Wright. (amf, )
August 27, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney Amy E. Johnson for Plaintiff CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
August 27, 2020 ***Attorney Charles Davenport Hudson terminated as to Defendant James Davis; Counsel does not represent this defendant pursuant to the #6 Notice of Appearance. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission of Amy Johnson Pro Hac Vice by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Weston, Frederick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Davenport Hudson on behalf of Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel, Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, Demecia Wright (Hudson, Charles) Modified on 8/28/2020 to remove as filed on behalf of Defendant James Davis (amf, ).
August 26, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines:Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel,Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, & Demecia Wright to 10/23/2020 per date on Waiver. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. Frank Arrington waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Melanie Blue waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Shayalia Bradford waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Margaret Daniel waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Angela Goldsmith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Angieneck Goldsmith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Ella Goldsmith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Jerome Goldsmith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Johnnie Goldsmith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Asheia Goode waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Pracey Gray waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Laura Johnson waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Michelle London waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Marcus Quinn waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Vakita Ragland waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Rebecca Smith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Talitha Smith waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Ashley Williams waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Latasha Wilson waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Patricia Ann Wilson waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Demecia Wright waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Weston, Frederick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2020 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-Government rules: #1 Redacted Main document) (am, ). Modified on 9/18/2020 to remove incorrect docket text(am, ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mayflower Investments, LLC; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (amf, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. (am, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 FED.R.CIV.P.7.1 Disclosure Statement by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. (am, )
August 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Frank Arrington, Melanie Blue, Shayalia Bradford, Margaret Daniel, James Davis, Angela Goldsmith, Angieneck Goldsmith, Ella Goldsmith, Jerome Goldsmith, Johnnie Goldsmith, Asheia Goode, Pracey Gray, Laura Johnson, Michelle London, Mayflower Investments, LLC, Marcus Quinn, Vakita Ragland, Rebecca Smith, Talitha Smith, Ashley Williams, Latasha Wilson, Patricia Ann Wilson, Demecia Wright, filed by CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602059131.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - redacted, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company v. Mayflower Investments, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayflower Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vakita Ragland
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demecia Wright
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Goldsmith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Goldsmith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talitha Smith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latasha Wilson
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Arrington
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle London
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angieneck Goldsmith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Williams
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Smith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Goldsmith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Johnson
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayalia Bradford
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Goldsmith
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ann Wilson
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asheia Goode
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Daniel
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Quinn
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pracey Gray
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Blue
Represented By: Charles Davenport Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CM Vantage Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Frederick Todd Weston
Represented By: Amy E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?