Tarver v. Tarver
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Tarver
Defendant: Susan A. Tarver
Case Number: 2:2020cv00690
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
3 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Timothy W. Tarver. (Norris, John) Modified on 10/26/2020 to clarify as a reply & not a response to reply (cwl, ).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEFING ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #12 motion to dismiss be submitted without oral argument on 11/3/2020. It is further ORDERED that plf file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before 10/27/2020. Plf may file a reply brief on or before 11/3/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/5/2020. (cwl, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Susan A. Tarver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss)(Cleveland, Clifford (Chip))
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Susan A. Tarver re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Cleveland, Clifford (Chip))
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 (RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus) MOTION to Dismiss by Susan A. Tarver. (Cleveland, Clifford (Chip)) Modified on 9/28/2020 to clarify the docket text & to add the link to the #3 motion (amf, ).
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Susan A. Tarver; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford (Chip) Wayne Cleveland, II on behalf of Susan A. Tarver (Cleveland, Clifford (Chip))
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Timothy W. Tarver re #2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Norris, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint & #5 Summons signed by illegible for Susan A. Tarver served on 9/12/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (cwl, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Susan A. Tarver; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson, Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case. (cwl, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Timothy W. Tarver; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Timothy W. Tarver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cwl, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF) against Susan A. Tarver ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059256.), filed by Timothy W. Tarver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(cwl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34) (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #35 Civil Cover Sheet, #36 receipt) (cwl, ). Modified on 9/4/2020 to clarify text (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #37 Original Signature Page) (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarver v. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Tarver
Represented By: John David Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan A. Tarver
Represented By: Clifford (Chip) Wayne Cleveland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?