Jones v. C. R. Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Marie Jones
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C. R. Bard Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00701
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 ***Attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk and Taylor Tapley Daly for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C. R. Bard Inc. added pursuant to the #39 and #40 motions. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 10/16/2020. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 43 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Marie Jones Corporate Disclosures due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(kh, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 42 Filing fee receieved re #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice : $ 75.00, receipt number 4602059756 (kh, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 41 Filing fee received re #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice : $ 75.00, receipt number 4602059757 (kh, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
October 5, 2020 Filing 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
September 25, 2020 *** Attorney Jordan E. Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews terminated pursuant to the court's 38 text order. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/25/2020. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDERED that the motions to dismiss (Docs. #3 , #9 ) are hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/23/2020.(kh, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines pending settlement discussions; STAYING all pending deadlines in this case for 90 days; directing the parties to file a joint Status Report on or before 12/17/2020, regarding the status of the settlement discussions, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/18/2020. (djy, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Plaintiff and by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc. and Marie Jones. (Maughan, Diane) Modified on 9/14/2020 to add as filed on behalf of the plaintiff. (kh, ).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims against McKesson Corporation ("McKesson") (Doc. #32 ) filed on September 8, 2020, the Plaintiff's claims against McKesson are hereby dismissed without prejudice on the terms set out and agreed to by the parties. The Plaintiff's claims against the other Defendants shall remain pending. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/8/2020. (kh, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc.. (Morris, George)
September 8, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly Filed by Plaintiff and by McKesson Corporation, Marie Jones, C.R. Bard, Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maughan, Diane) Modified on 9/8/2020 to add as filed on behalf of additional parties. (kh, ).
September 8, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Melissa Dorman Matthews and Jordan E. Jarreau by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Maughan, Diane)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by George LaFayette Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc., McKesson Corporation (Morris, George)
September 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Babb Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc., McKesson Corporation (Maughan, Diane)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED that the parties' FED.R.CIV.P. 26(f) Report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than September 29, 2020, as further set. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/8/2020. (kh, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02686. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #20 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows:a. Plaintiff Rudy Adkinss case be severed and transferred to the Toledo Division of the Northern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2683-S opened); b. Plaintiff Reginald Crosbys case be severed and transferred to the Eastern Division of the Northern District of Illinois (Civil case 3:20-cv-2684-S opened); c. Plaintiff Darcy Duncans case be severed and transferred to the Syracuse Division of the Northern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2685-S opened); d. Plaintiff Marie Joness case be severed and transferred to the Northern Division of the Middle District of Alabama (Civil case 3:20-cv-2686-S opened);e. Plaintiff Jeffrey Osborns case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2687-S opened);f. Plaintiff Stephen Pietericks case be severed and transferred to the San Antonio Division of the Western District of Texas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2688-S opened);g. Plaintiff Norma Renterias case be severed and transferred to the Las Cruces Division of the District of New Mexico (Civil case 3:20-cv-2689-S opened);h. Plaintiff Steve Robersons case be severed and transferred to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2690-S opened);i. Plaintiff Katherine Sepelaks case be severed and transferred to the New Haven Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2691-S opened). Plaintiff Elzie Newsom is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (axm) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Reginald Crosby (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***DISREGARD, WRONG ORDER***ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) Modified on 7/16/2020 (mla). [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (TEXT) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.] Modified on 9/4/2020 to reflect there is NO PDF document for this entry (qc/djy, ).
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ruby Adkins, Reginald Crosby, Darcy Duncan, Marie Jones, Elzie Newsom, Jeffrey Osborn, Stephen Pieterick, Norma Renteria, Steve Roberson, Katherine Sepelak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by McKesson Corporation. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #11 ). (djy, )
June 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry #8 ). (djy, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/10/2020) (svc) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marie Jones. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
June 9, 2020 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard Inc., McKesson Corporation, filed by Marie Jones. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900478) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 2020-04-07 Original Petition, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 2020-04-07 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 2020-04-07 Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 2020-04-07 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 2020-06-04 State Court Docket, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-05-06 Return of Service - McKesson Corp, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard) (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. C. R. Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Brandee J. Kowalzyk
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Represented By: George LaFayette Morris, IV
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Jones
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?