Drotos v. Ollie's Bargain Outlet
Plaintiff: Rayla Drotos
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet
Case Number: 2:2020cv00732
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED Notice of Removal by Ollie's Bargain Outlet. . (Sydnor, James) Modified on 11/5/2020 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is therefore the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the defendant has until 11/10/2020, to amend the notice of removal to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, see 28 U.S.C. 1653; otherwise this lawsuit shall be remanded to state court, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/27/2020. (am, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sydnor, James)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Business Entity Disclosure Statement by Ollie's Bargain Outlet re: #4 Notice of Deficiency. (Sydnor, James) Modified on 9/18/2020 to add linkage & clarify text as reflected in pleading(am, ).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 10/15/2020, as further set out in Order; DIRECTING the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 10/15/2020, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 9/17/2020. (am, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ollie's Bargain Outlet; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Rayla Drotos & Ollie's Bargain Outlet. (am, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Ollie's Bargain Outlet.(am, )
September 11, 2020 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Ollie's Bargain Outlet. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )
September 11, 2020 COMPLAINT against Ollie's Bargain Outlet, filed by Rayla Drotos. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ollie's Bargain Outlet from Circuit Court of Autauga County, AL, case number 04-CV-2020-900154.00. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602059409) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drotos v. Ollie's Bargain Outlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie's Bargain Outlet
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayla Drotos
Represented By: Robert Lester Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?