Kennedy et al v. NewRez, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Kennedy, Jr., Betty Ann Kenned and Betty Ann Kennedy
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation, NewRez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Servicing and NewRez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 2:2020cv00802
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that Doc. #7 is DENIED as MOOT. (See Doc. #17 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/30/2020. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SN Servicing Corporation.(Baker, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Error re #13 Conflict Disclosure Statement, which is hereby STRICKEN as a duplicate entry. (am, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by SN Servicing Corporation re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Baker, Mark)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 Conflict Disclosure Statement by NewRez, LLC re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Premo, Grant)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 STRICKEN AS A DUPLICATE ENTRY PURSUANT TO #16 NOTICE OF ERROR - See doc #14 Statement for Correct Filing) Conflict Disclosure Statement by NewRez, LLC re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Premo, Grant) Modified on 11/13/2020 (am, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to NewRez, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/23/2020. (am, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2020: #1 Standing Order & Sample) (am, ).
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for NewRez, LLC. (am, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NewRez, LLC.(Premo, Grant)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to SN Servicing Corporation; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for SN Servicing Corporation. (am, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SN Servicing Corporation. (Baker, Mark)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Allan Baker on behalf of SN Servicing Corporation (Baker, Mark)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by Kelly Webster for NewRez, LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020; SN Servicing Corporation served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (am, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NewRez, LLC, SN Servicing Corporation and mailed CMRRRR with copy of #1 complaint. (kh, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLFs) Betty Ann Kennedy, James Kennedy, Jr. (bes, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Betty Ann Kennedy, James Kennedy, Jr. (bes, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NewRez, LLC, SN Servicing Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059734.), filed by James Kennedy, Jr, Betty Ann Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy et al v. NewRez, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kennedy, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Kenned
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Kennedy
Represented By: Anthony Brian Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Mark Allan Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Grant A. Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?