Williams v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Williams
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company and Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00822
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Riopka, Ashlee)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 12/22/2020, as further set out in Order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/1/2020. (am, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan.(Murphy, Grace)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 12/7/2020, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/10/2020. (bes, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Upon consideration of the #7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plf's Complaint, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; The dfts shall file a responsive pleading to the plf's #1 complaint, on or before 11/30/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/10/2020. (bes, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Murphy, Grace)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan. (amf, )
November 9, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorneys Ashlee Dee Riopka, Grace Robinson Murphy, & William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr for Defendant Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company & Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (amf, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Murphy, Grace)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Murphy, Grace)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, Home Deport Welfare Benefits Plan. (Murphy, Grace) Modified on 11/10/2020 to add as also filed on behalf of Defendant Home Depot (amf, ).
November 9, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 MOTION - Attorney William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr. & Ashlee Dee Riopka for Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company & Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint signed by illegible for Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (am, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for: Aetna Life Insurance Company served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (wcl, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, & Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan; mailed by CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (amf, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Sheila Williams. (am, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sheila Williams. (am, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan, filed by Sheila Williams. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602059789.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlee Dee Riopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlee Dee Riopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Ashlee Dee Riopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Williams
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: David Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?