Bice v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bice
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00916
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/22/2020. (bes, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 1/25/2021; Do NOT file the Consent form nor the Reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/22/2020. (bes, )
December 9, 2020 ***PURSUANT TO THE #9 ANSWER - Attorney Michael David Strasavich for O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc..(Wasden, Harold)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (bes, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold William Wasden on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Wasden, Harold)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Bice. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Wrady, Joshua)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Bice re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Wrady, Joshua)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service.(kh, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Stephanie Bice; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Stephanie Bice. (bes, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602060142.), filed by Stephanie Bice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Receipt)(bes, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #7 Original Signature Page) (kh, ).
November 9, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephanie Bice. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bice v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bice
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Wrady
Represented By: Courtney Brooks Crampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Harold William Wasden
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?