Harry v. Cohen (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Kason Jamel Harry
Defendant: Allen Cohen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00104
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Petitioner is GRANTED an extension to an including 4/2/2021, to re-submit the filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Montgomery Federal Prison Camp. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 3/16/2021. (furn: cashier) (order provided as directed)(cwl, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 2/25/2021, Petitioner shall file either the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a prison account statement from the prison account clerk showing the balance in his inmate account at the time of his filing this petition or, if he does not seek in forma pauperis treatment, the $5.00 filing fee, as further set out in order; copy mailed to account clerk at the Montgomery Federal Prison Camp as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/8/2021. (wcl, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kason Jamel Harry.(NO IFP; NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harry v. Cohen (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kason Jamel Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?