McNeal v. US Attorney General et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Eldrick Deon McNeal
Defendant: US Attorney General, Myron H. Thompson and Warden of Butner Federal Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv00112
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Myron H Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Received email from ED/NC regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ED/NC case number assigned as case 5:21-hc-02080.(No PDF attached to this entry). (amf, )
March 31, 2021 Case transferred to the Eastern District of North Carolina; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The magistrate judge's #4 recommendation is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina pursuant to 28 USC 1631; 3) The #3 motion for appointment of counsel and reasonable accommodations is left pending for resolution by the transferee court; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (amf, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 4602062766. (amf, )
March 24, 2021 No objections filed to the #4 Recommendation. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL Case Laws by Eldrick Deon McNeal. (amf, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina pursuant to 28 USC 1631; Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/3/2021. (amf, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel & Reasonable Accomadations by Eldrick Deon McNeal. (am, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Eldrick Deon McNeal. (NO FILING FEE; NO IFP)(am, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Received copy of ORDER entered on 2/8/2021 in Criminal Case 2:15-cr-00199-MHT directing the clerk to: Strike documents 314 & 315 from this criminal case; open a new civil action under 28 U.S.C. 2241; and docket these motions in the newly opened civil action; assign the newly opened civil action to the magistrate judge and district judge to whom the instant case is assigned and refer the case to the appropriate magistrate judge. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/8/2021. (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. US Attorney General et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldrick Deon McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Butner Federal Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?